Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2786183


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.10.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.04.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.02.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.10.2018 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
02.10.2018 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
01.10.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.09.2018 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.08.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.09.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.09.2017 Change - representative
29.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.02.2017 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
27.01.2017 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.01.2017 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
23.01.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.08.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.12.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.05.2015 First examination report
30.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
24.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
04.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication