Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795104

EP2795104 - AN EROSION SHIELD FOR A WIND TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, BE
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LM Wind Power International Technology II ApS
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2018/15]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
LM WP Patent Holding A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Inventor(s)01 / HAAG, Michael Drachmann
Søndre Fovrfeldvej 1B
DK-6710 Esbjerg V / DK
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)COPA Copenhagen Patents
Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor
1970 Frederiksberg C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2018/22]Heinrich, Bernd , et al
LM WP Patent Holding A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Former [2014/44]Hussey, Paul Anthony
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Application number, filing date12799133.905.12.2012
[2018/22]
WO2012EP74488
Priority number, dateEP2011019423919.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11194239
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092211
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795104
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795104
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:F03D1/06
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EROSIONSSCHIRM FÜR EINE WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL[2014/44]
English:AN EROSION SHIELD FOR A WIND TURBINE BLADE[2014/44]
French:PROTECTION ANTI-ÉROSION POUR PALE DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
05.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2018Fee for grant paid
28.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.11.2017
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.05.2018
AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU05.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/40]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU05.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU05.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/03]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009118545  (BLADE DYNAMICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,13,15 * page 4, lines 13-15 * * page 6, lines 8-22 * * page 8, lines 13-17 * * page 10, lines 5-8; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]US2011142678  (SANTIAGO PEDRO LUIS BENITO [ES], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3-8 *;
 [A]WO2008157013  (HONTEK CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 5-25; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2004118978  (ANNING BRUCE D [CA]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5306120  (HAMMER JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 37-45 *;
 [A]US3144349  (SWINGLER RALPH F N, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *
by applicantEP2153065