Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791828

EP2791828 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYSIS AND RECONSTRUCTION OF VARIABLE PULSE-WIDTH SIGNALS WITH FINITE-RATES-OF-INNOVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.08.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.09.2015  [2015/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / QUICK, Roy Franklin, Jr.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / CROCHIERE, Ronald Eldon
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / HONG, John Hyunchul
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Howe, Steven
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date12799376.408.11.2012
WO2012US64196
Priority number, dateUS201161570741P14.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161570741 P
US20121355220618.07.2012         Original published format: US201213552206
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013089949
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2791828
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/14, H03M7/30
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE UND REKONSTRUKTION VON SIGNALEN MIT VARIABLER PULSBREITE UND ENDLICHEN INNOVATIONSRATEN[2014/43]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYSIS AND RECONSTRUCTION OF VARIABLE PULSE-WIDTH SIGNALS WITH FINITE-RATES-OF-INNOVATION[2014/43]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE ET DE RECONSTRUCTION DE SIGNAUX DE LARGEUR D'IMPULSION VARIABLE AVEC DES TAUX FINIS D'INNOVATION[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
17.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/37]
17.03.2015Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
21.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/37]
21.04.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - OUAMRI A ET AL, "ECG compression method using Lorentzian functions model", DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20061202), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.DSP.2006.07.003, ISSN 1051-2004, pages 319 - 326, XP005724191 [X] 1-3,5-16,18-20,23-25 * sections 1-3 * * sections 5.1, 5.2; figures 1-3 * [I] 4,17,21,22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dsp.2006.07.003
 [XI]  - Naït-Ali A, "Compression of physiological signals", Compression of Biomedical Images and Signals, ISTE and John Wiley & Sons, (2008), pages 129 - 153, XP055121451 [X] 1-3,5-16,18-20,23-25 * sections 6.1, 6.4.3 * * section 6.4.4.1.1 * * section 6.4.4.2 * * section 6.4.5, paragraphs 1, 2 * [I] 4,17,21,22
 [XAI]  - NIRANJAN U ET AL, "ECG component delineation by Prony's method", SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. 31, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0165-1684(93)90065-I, ISSN 0165-1684, (199303), pages 191 - 202, (19930301), XP026671027 [X] 10,13,14,16,19,20,23-25 * sections 1-3, 6.1 * [A] 1-9,11,12,15,18 [I] 17,21,22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-1684(93)90065-I
 [XA]  - CLIFFORD G D ET AL, "Model-based filtering, compression and classification of the ECG", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOELECTROMAGNETISM, (2005), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1456-7857, pages 158 - 161, XP055094653 [X] 10,11 * sections 1, 2.1, 2.2 * [A] 1-9,12-25
 [A]  - MAGGS J E ET AL, "Generality of deterministic chaos, exponential spectra, and Lorentzian pulses in magnetically confined plasmas", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (201110), vol. 107, no. 18, doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.107.185003, ISSN 0031-9007, XP055121534 [A] 2,5,11,15,18 * page 2 and 3: equation (3), figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.107.185003
 [A]  - KING F W, "Efficient numerical approach to the evaluation of Kramers-Kronig transforms", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA B, (200210), vol. 19, no. 10, doi:10.1364/JOSAB.19.002427, ISSN 0740-3224, pages 2427 - 2436, XP055122017 [A] 2,5,11,15,18 * section 5: equations (55) and (56) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAB.19.002427
 [A]  - BLOOR D ET AL, "Optical properties of bis (p-Toluene Sulphonate) diacetylene - II. Low-temperature spectra", PHYSICA STATUS SOLIDI, (1997), vol. 39, pages 607 - 614, XP055122046 [A] 2,5,11,15,18 * section 2.1, paragraphs 1 and 2; equation (1) *
 [AD]  - HAO Y ET AL, "Compression of ECG as a signal with Finite Rate of Innovation", 27TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY (IEEE-EMBS 2005), 1-4 SEPTEMBER 2005, SHANGHAI, CHINA, (200509), doi:10.1109/IEMBS.2005.1616262, ISBN 978-0-7803-8741-6, pages 7564 - 7567, XP010908229 [AD] 1-25 * sections I-IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2005.1616262
 [XPI]  - Baechler G, "Sensing ECG signals with Variable Pulse Width Finite Rate of Innovation", Master's Thesis, Communication Systems, École Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne, Switzerland, (20120316), URL: http://infoscience.epfl.ch/record/185238/files/thesis.pdf, (20140530), XP055120865 [XP] 1-3,6-16,18-25 * title page; page iii * * section 1.1.1 * * sections 2.2 and 3.2.2 * * section 3.3.2 * [I] 4,17
 [L]  - Anonymous, "Sensing ECG signals with variable pulse width finite rate of innovation", EPFL Infoscience record, (20140226), URL: http://infoscience.epfl.ch/record/185238, (20140606), XP055122033 [L] * the whole document *
 [IP]  - QUICK R F ET AL, "Extension of FRI for modeling of electrocardiogram signals", 2012 ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, 28 AUGUST - 1 SEPTEMBER 2012, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, (20120828), doi:10.1109/EMBC.2012.6346572, ISBN 978-1-42-444120-4, pages 2909 - 2912, XP055053558 [IP] 1-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EMBC.2012.6346572
 [T]  - BAECHLER G ET AL, "Finite rate of innovation based modeling and compression of ECG signals", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP 2013), 26-31 MAY 2013, VANCOUVER, CANADA, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2013.6637851, ISSN 1520-6149, (20130526), pages 1252 - 1256, (20131018), XP032508088 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2013.6637851
 [T]  - Nair A et al, "Multichannel ECG analysis using VPW-FRI", 10th International Conference on Sampling Theory and Applications (SampTA2013), 1-5 July 2013, Bremen, Germany, (20130701), pages 125 - 128, URL: http://www.eurasip.org/Proceedings/Ext/SampTA2013/papers/p125-nair.pdf, (20140530), XP055120861 [T] * the whole document *
by applicant   - M. VETTERLI; P. MARZILIANO; T. BLU, "Sampling Signals with Finite Rate of Innovation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESING, (200206), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 1417 - 1428
    - T. BLU; P.L. DRAGOTTI; M. VETTERLI; P. MARZILIANO; L COULOT, "Sparse Sampling of Signal Innovations: Theory, Algorithms, and Performance Bounds", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, (200803), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 31 - 40, XP011206128
    - Y. HAO; P. MARZILIANO; M. VETTERLI; T. BLU, "Compression of ECG as a Signal with Finite Rate of Innovation", PROC. OF THE 2005 IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY 27TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE, SHANGHAI, CHINA, (20050901), doi:doi:10.1109/IEMBS.2005.1616262, pages 7564 - 7567, XP010908229

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2005.1616262
    - MARZILIANO; M. VETTERLI; T. BLU, "Sampling and Exact Reconstruction of Bandlimited Signals With Additive Shot Noise", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (200605), vol. 52, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/TIT.2006.872844, pages 2230 - 2233, XP055043300

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2006.872844