Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785937

EP2785937 - PIN LATCH WITH DETECTION DEVICE AND MOVABLE CATCH-PIN AND INTERMEDIATE POSITION WITH AUTOMATIC RETURN MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2018  [2018/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arconic Inc.
201 Isabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US
For all designated states
Do, Thai
24392 Kings View
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US
[2017/15]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Alcoa Inc.
Alcoa Corporate Center
201 Isabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US
For all designated states
Do, Thai
24392 Kings View
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DO, Thai
24392 Kings View
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Trinks, Ole , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12799398.820.11.2012
WO2012US66039
Priority number, dateUS201161566254P02.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161566254 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081910
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785937
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05B41/00, E05C1/06
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:STIFTVERRIEGELUNG MIT DETEKTOR UND BEWEGLICHEM ANHALTESTIFT SOWIE ZWISCHENPOSITION MIT AUTOMATISCHEM RÜCKSTELLMECHANISMUS[2014/41]
English:PIN LATCH WITH DETECTION DEVICE AND MOVABLE CATCH-PIN AND INTERMEDIATE POSITION WITH AUTOMATIC RETURN MECHANISM[2014/41]
French:VERROU À BROCHE AYANT UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET BROCHE-TAQUET MOBILE ET POSITION INTERMÉDIAIRE AYANT UN MÉCANISME DE RAPPEL AUTOMATIQUE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2014National basic fee paid 
02.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
14.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/26]
09.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XAI]GB1497982  (HESTERBERG & SOEHNE F) [X] 1 * page 2, line 77 - page 3, line 91; figures 3,4,5,10 * [A] 14 [I] 2-13;
 [A]GB1537410  (HARTWELL CORP) [A] 1,3,5,7-9,11-25 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 112; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]DE29807738U  (HESTERBERG & SOEHNE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,3,6,10,14 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 19; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2397503  (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,5,8,9,13,14 * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4828299  (POE L RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 58 - column 9, line 23; figures 1-19 *;
 [A]EP1091059  (HARTWELL CORP [US]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *