Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785513

EP2785513 - METHOD OF TREATING A LENS FORMING SURFACE OF AT LEAST ONE MOLD HALF FOR MOLDING OPHTHALMIC LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2016/51]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUZAWA, Yasuo
10450 Turner Road
Roswell, GA 30076 / US
02 / BOTHE, Harald
Engenhahner Strasse 14
65527 Niedernhausen / DE
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[2014/45]
Former [2014/41]Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36
4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date12799413.526.11.2012
[2016/51]
WO2012US66510
Priority number, dateUS201161564443P29.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161564443 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081959
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785513
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785513
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29D11/00, B29C33/72
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBA13.06.2014
ME13.06.2014
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER OBERFLÄCHE ZUR FORMUNG EINER LINSE AUS MINDESTENS EINER GUSSFORMHÄLFTE ZUM GIESSEN VON KONTAKTLINSEN[2014/41]
English:METHOD OF TREATING A LENS FORMING SURFACE OF AT LEAST ONE MOLD HALF FOR MOLDING OPHTHALMIC LENSES[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE FORMANT UNE LENTILLE D'AU MOINS UN DEMI-MOULE POUR MOULAGE DE LENTILLES OPHTALMIQUES[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
15.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2016Fee for grant paid
01.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2016
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2018/33]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1407866  (MENICON CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,12-14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0041] , [0042]; figure - * [Y] 6,7,9-11,15;
 [Y]US2003163196  (ROTHAUG MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] , [0010] , [0 14]; figure . *;
 [Y]EP1201253  (MENICON CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9-11 * paragraphs [0053] , [00 8] - [0010] - [0032] , [0044]; figure 6 *;
 [Y]US6841008  (BRANCO WALTER G [US] ET AL) [Y] 6,7 * claim - *;
 [Y]WO0076738  (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [Y] 15 * page 1 *
by applicantWO9842497
 EP0686469
 EP0740997
 WO2009085902
 WO2010071691
 CA92121
 WO2012016097