Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2795737


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
26.01.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
23.06.2017 Change - inventor published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
17.02.2017 (Expected) grant published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
14.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.02.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2015 Change - representative
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
23.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
16.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication