Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2795737 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280069557 EP12799559



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013092278Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011IB03314 23.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104115343BGlobal Dossier 18.05.2016B
CN104115343 22.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011IB03314 23.12.2011
WO2012EP74984 10.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2795737Global Dossier 22.03.2017B1
EP2795737 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011IB03314 23.12.2011
WO2012EP74984 10.12.2012