Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795737

EP2795737 - CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY WITH SEAL PROTECTION CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi International Operations Luxembourg S.à r.l.
Avenue de Luxembourg
4940 Bascharage / LU
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULZ, Claudia
Laurentiusstrasse 31
90451 Nuernberg / DE
02 / MUELLER, Klaus
Haupstrasse 25
91610 INSINGEN / DE
 [2017/30]
Former [2014/44]01 / SCHULZ, Claudia
Laurentiusstrasse 31
90451 Nuernberg / DE
Representative(s)Delphi France SAS
c/o Delphi Technologies
Campus Saint Christophe
Bâtiment Galilée 2
10, avenue de l'Entreprise
95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/12]Delphi France SAS
Patent Department
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
Former [2014/44]Allart, René Paul Pruli Slamet , et al
Delphi France SAS
Legal Staff - Patents
Bât. Le Raspail, ZAC Paris Nord II
22, avenue des Nations
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12799559.510.12.2012
[2017/12]
WO2012EP74984
Priority number, dateWO2011IB0331423.12.2011         Original published format: PCT/IB2011/003314
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092278
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795737
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795737
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/52, H01R13/629
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDERANORDNUNG MIT DICHTUNGSSCHUTZKAPPE[2014/44]
English:CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY WITH SEAL PROTECTION CAP[2014/44]
French:ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR MUNI DE CAPUCHON DE PROTECTION DE JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
22.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2017Fee for grant paid
10.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2016
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.12.2012
AT22.03.2017
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MK22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE10.12.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU10.12.2012
AT22.03.2017
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE10.12.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU10.12.2012
AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE10.12.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE10.12.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE10.12.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE10.12.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE10.12.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
LU10.12.2017
MT10.12.2017
Former [2018/14]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAI]DE19844689  (DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-13,15-17 * figures 1,2,3,4,6 * * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 62 * * column 4, lines 25-31 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 9 * [A] 3 [I] 14;
 [A]EP1117157  (LEAR AUTOMOTIVE EEDS SPAIN [ES]) [A] 14 * figure 4 *;
 [AD]US2009275227  (FUJIWARA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [AD] 3 * figure 16 *;
 [AD]US2001024908  (NAKAMURA MITSUHARU [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * figure 1a *
by applicantUS7044762
 US2001024908
 US2009275227
 US7384258
 US2006211286
 US2006040535