Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786598

EP2786598 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GROUP BASED ACCESS CONTROL OF MACHINE TO MACHINE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / CHERIAN, George
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / WANG, Jun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / GOGIC, Aleksandar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12799696.503.12.2012
WO2012US67655
Priority number, dateUS201161566129P02.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161566129 P
US201261624207P13.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261624207 P
WO2012CN8252003.10.2012         Original published format: PCT/CN2012/082520
US20121369164330.11.2012         Original published format: US201213691643
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013082628
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2786598
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/00, H04W4/08, H04W4/14, H04W68/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GRUPPENBASIERTEN ZUGANGSKONTROLLE VON M2M-VORRICHTUNGEN[2014/41]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GROUP BASED ACCESS CONTROL OF MACHINE TO MACHINE DEVICES[2014/41]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS À BASE DE GROUPE DE DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE MACHINES[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
16.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
30.03.2015Request for decision received: Claims
30.03.2015Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
14.04.2015Result of request for decision (Claims): Request accepted
14.04.2015Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
27.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011274040  (PANI DIANA [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-55 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0172] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2010057485  (LUFT ACHIM [DE]) [X] 1-55 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0172] *;
 [X]US2011199905  (PINHEIRO ANA LUCIA [US] ET AL) [X] 1-55 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0216] * * figures 1-10 *;
 [X]WO2011087826  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]; SHAHEEN KAMEL M [US]; PURKAYASTHA D) [X] 1-55 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0133] * * figures 1-9B *;
 [X]WO2011100497  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]; GOMES SYLVIE [US]; PANI DIANA [CA];) [X] 1-55 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0124] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]WO2011018017  (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]; LONG SHUIPING [CN]; JIN HUI [CN]; DUAN XIAO) [X] 56-92 * the whole document *;
 [P]EP2456161  (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0185] * * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]  - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATION CORPORATION, "Device Based Optimization Solution for Smart Metering support in 3GPP System", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-101007_S2_78_TD_DEVICE BASED OPTIMIZATION SOLUTION FOR SMART METERING SUPPORT IN 3GPP SYSTEM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100213), vol. SA WG2, no. San Francisco, USA; 20100222, XP050433603 [X] 1-55 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ZTE ET AL, "Proposal on adding USSD to the MTC Architectural Baseline", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-100085 DATA TRANSMISSION VIA USSD, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100112), vol. SA WG2, no. Shenzhen; 20100118, XP050432714 [X] 56-92 * the whole document *
 [I]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Service requirements for Machine-Type Communications (MTC); Stage 1 (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 22.368, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110930), vol. SA WG1, no. V11.3.0, pages 1 - 24, XP050554259 [I] 1-92 * section 4-7 *