Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2777313

EP2777313 - OPTIMIZING VEHICULAR DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ACCESS USING CASE-BASED LEARNING TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / VUYYURU, Rama K
3042 Pellier Pl
San Jose, California 95135 / US
02 / CHEN, Si
465 Bernardo Avenue
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
 [2017/28]
Former [2014/49]01 / VUYYURU, Rama
3042 Pellier Pl
San Jose, California 95135 / US
02 / CHEN, Si
465 Bernardo Avenue
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
Former [2014/38]01 / VUYYURU, Rama
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
02 / CHEN, Si
Atherton, California 94027 / US
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2017/37]
Former [2014/38]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date12801645.809.11.2012
[2017/37]
WO2012JP79873
Priority number, dateUS20111329408410.11.2011         Original published format: US201113294084
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013069819
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2777313
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2777313
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/14, H04W74/08
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERUNG EINES DYNAMISCHEN FAHRZEUGSPEKTRUMZUGANGS MIT FALLBASIERTEN LERNTECHNIKEN[2014/38]
English:OPTIMIZING VEHICULAR DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ACCESS USING CASE-BASED LEARNING TECHNIQUES[2014/38]
French:OPTIMISATION D'ACCÈS DYNAMIQUE AU SPECTRE POUR VÉHICULE À L'AIDE DE TECHNIQUES D'APPRENTISSAGE PAR CAS[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase20.05.2014National basic fee paid 
20.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
08.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2017Fee for grant paid
01.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2014
Opposition(s)14.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE09.11.2017
LU09.11.2017
MT09.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/50]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE09.11.2017
LU09.11.2017
MT09.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE09.11.2017
LU09.11.2017
MT09.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
LU09.11.2017
MT09.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/41]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
LU09.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/33]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]  - SI CHEN ET AL, "Feasibility analysis of vehicular dynamic spectrum access via queueing theory model", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20111101), vol. 49, no. 11, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2011.6069723, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 156 - 163, XP011364918 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2011.6069723
 [A]  - HAMED AHMADI ET AL, "Predictive opportunistic spectrum access using learning based hidden Markov models", PERSONAL INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS (PIMRC), 2011 IEEE 22ND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20110911), doi:10.1109/PIMRC.2011.6139991, ISBN 978-1-4577-1346-0, pages 401 - 405, XP032102391 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2011.6139991
 [XP]  - SI CHEN ET AL, "Learning-Based Channel Selection of VDSA Networks in Shared TV Whitespace", 2012 IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (VTC FALL), (20120901), doi:10.1109/VTCFall.2012.6399045, ISBN 978-1-46-731879-2, pages 1 - 5, XP055051283 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTCFall.2012.6399045
 [IP]  - SI CHEN ET AL, "Learning in vehicular dynamic spectrum access networks: Opportunities and challenges", INTELLIGENT SIGNAL PROCESSING AND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS (ISPACS), 2011 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20111207), doi:10.1109/ISPACS.2011.6146215, ISBN 978-1-4577-2165-6, pages 1 - 6, XP032107744 [IP] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISPACS.2011.6146215
 [IP]  - SI CHEN ET AL, "On optimizing vehicular dynamic spectrum access networks: Automation and learning in mobile wireless environments", VEHICULAR NETWORKING CONFERENCE (VNC), 2011 IEEE, IEEE, (20111114), doi:10.1109/VNC.2011.6117122, ISBN 978-1-4673-0049-0, pages 39 - 46, XP032081866 [IP] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VNC.2011.6117122