Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788955

EP2788955 - METHOD OF ANALYZING VIDEO OR IMAGE DATA OF AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / AGAMI, Sion
3738 Windyhollow Way
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
02 / DUVAL, Dean, Larry
365 Chadwick Court
Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Mather, Peter Geoffrey
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Mather, Peter Geoffrey
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date12801786.004.12.2012
[2015/38]
WO2012US67664
Priority number, dateUS20111331256406.12.2011         Original published format: US201113312564
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085857
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788955
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2788955
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00, G06T7/60
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON VIDEO- ODER BILDDATEN EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKELS[2014/42]
English:METHOD OF ANALYZING VIDEO OR IMAGE DATA OF AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2014/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES VIDÉO OU DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES D'UN ARTICLE ABSORBANT[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2014National basic fee paid 
29.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
07.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2015Fee for grant paid
03.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.05.2015
Opposition(s)17.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2012
AL16.09.2015
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU04.12.2012
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2018/31]HU04.12.2012
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2017/39]HU04.12.2012
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/49]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/46]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/45]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/34]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
LU04.12.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/33]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/24]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/14]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT16.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2008175575  (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007058840  (SINGH RAJESH K [US] ET AL SINGH RAJESH KUMAR [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004107222  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]; PIEPER CHRISTOPHER M [US]; WOLTMAN GARRY ROLAN) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005088484  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; MACURA MATTHEW JOSEPH [US]; FELLER BRYAN KEITH) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003112999  (CALVERT MICKEY [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3929135
 US4324246
 US4342314
 US4463045
 US5006394
 US4573986
 US3911173
 US4785996
 US4842666