Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2723348

EP2723348 - METHOD FOR TREATING OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leighton, Anton
66 Schooner Hill
Oakland, California 94618 / US
[2018/49]
Former [2014/18]For all designated states
Rhamnopharma Inc.
66 Schooner Hill
Oakland, CA 94618 / US
For all designated states
Leighton, Anton
66 Schooner Hill
Oakland, California 94618 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/33]
Former [2014/18]01 / LEIGHTON, Anton
66 Schooner Hill
Oakland California 94618 / US
Representative(s)Crease, Devanand John , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[2019/33]
Former [2014/18]Crease, Devanand John , et al
Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Application number, filing date12802076.519.06.2012
[2019/33]
WO2012US43075
Priority number, dateUS201161499638P21.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161499638 P
US201161515806P05.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161515806 P
US201261641117P01.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261641117 P
[2014/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012177593
Date:27.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2723348
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012
[2014/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2723348
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7028, A61P3/04, A61P3/00, A61K8/60, A61Q19/06
[2015/09]
Former International [2014/18]A61K31/7028, A61K31/7024, A61K31/70, A61P3/04, A61P3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ADIPOSITAS[2014/18]
English:METHOD FOR TREATING OBESITY[2014/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE L'OBÉSITÉ[2014/18]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2014National basic fee paid 
21.01.2014Search fee paid 
21.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/18]
20.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
01.07.2019Fee for grant paid
01.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.08.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
01.07.2019Request for further processing filed
01.07.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.07.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201403   M06   Fee paid on   04.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009220603  (PILJAC TATJANA [HR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0044] *;
 [A]US5455232  (PILJAC GORAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US5514661  (PILJAC GORAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US2006100172  (MONSAN PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0032] *
International search[A]US5455232  (PILJAC, G. ET AL.);
 [A]US5514661  (PILJAC, G. ET AL.);
 [A]US2009220603  (PILJAC, T. ET AL.);
 [A]US2006062863  (GHOSAL, S.);
 [A]US2006100172  (MONSAN, P. ET AL.)