Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2725788

EP2725788 - RECEPTION TERMINAL, VIEWING INFORMATION COLLECTION SYSTEM, AND VIEWING INFORMATION COLLECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2014/18]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUBARA, Masami
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / MAEDA, Shinji
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / FUKASAWA, Tsukasa
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / MIURA, Shin
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2014/18]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date12802655.621.06.2012
WO2012JP65851
Priority number, dateJP2011013870822.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011138708
JP2012000403112.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012004031
[2014/18]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012176835
Date:27.12.2012
Language:JA
[2012/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2725788
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.12.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173, H04H60/31, H04N5/765, H04N5/91, H04N17/00
[2014/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/18]
TitleGerman:EMPFANGSGERÄT, SYSTEM ZUR SAMMLUNG VON ANZEIGEINFORMATIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR SAMMLUNG VON ANZEIGEINFORMATIONEN[2014/18]
English:RECEPTION TERMINAL, VIEWING INFORMATION COLLECTION SYSTEM, AND VIEWING INFORMATION COLLECTION METHOD[2014/18]
French:TERMINAL DE RÉCEPTION, SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE D'INFORMATIONS DE VISUALISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE D'INFORMATIONS DE VISUALISATION[2014/18]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2014Translation filed 
09.01.2014National basic fee paid 
09.01.2014Search fee paid 
09.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/18]
22.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007050832  (WRIGHT DAVID H [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0033] - [0043] - [0045] - [0060] - [0071]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2010114527  (LEE MORRIS [US]) [A] 1,5,9,10 * paragraph [0043]; figure 1 *
International search[A]JP2000358255  (TWO WAY TV LTD);
 [A]JP2010171514  (NTT DOCOMO INC);
 [A]JP2004064368  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JP2002305760  (NEC CORP)
by applicantJP2010233268
 JP2006174291
 JP2010233143
 JPH0723012