Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2725055

EP2725055 - MOLDING MATERIAL, MOLDING METHOD USING SAME, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDING MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, BG, GR, HR, IS, LV, RS, SE
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toray Industries, Inc.
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[2014/18]
Inventor(s)01 / IMAI, Naokichi
c/o Ehime Plant
Toray Industries, Inc.
1515, Oaza-tsutsui
Masaki-cho, Iyo-gun
Ehime 7913193 / JP
02 / TSUCHIYA, Atsuki
c/o Ehime Plant
Toray Industries, Inc.
1515, Oaza-tsutsui
Masaki-cho, Iyo-gun
Ehime 7913193 / JP
03 / HONMA, Masato
c/o Ehime Plant
Toray Industries, Inc.
1515, Oaza-tsutsui
Masaki-cho, Iyo-gun
Ehime 7913193 / JP
04 / YAMASHITA, Kohei
c/o Nagoya Plant
Toray Industries, Inc.
9-1, Oe-cho, Minato-ku
Nagoya-shi
Aichi 4558502 / JP
05 / HORIUCHI, Shunsuke
c/o Nagoya Plant
Toray Industries, Inc.
9-1, Oe-cho, Minato-ku
Nagoya-shi
Aichi 4558502 / JP
06 / YAMAUCHI, Koji
c/o Nagoya Plant
Toray Industries, Inc.
9-1, Oe-cho, Minato-ku
Nagoya-shi
Aichi 4558502 / JP
 [2014/18]
Representative(s)Webster, Jeremy Mark , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2017/41]
Former [2014/18]Webster, Jeremy Mark , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date12802922.020.06.2012
[2017/41]
WO2012JP65701
Priority number, dateJP2011014068924.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011140689
JP2011014069024.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011140690
JP2011014069124.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011140691
JP2011014069224.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011140692
JP2011014069324.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011140693
[2014/18]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012176788
Date:27.12.2012
Language:JA
[2012/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2725055
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2725055
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.12.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B29B15/12, B29C70/52, B29C70/30, C08J5/04, C08L71/08, B29C70/48
[2017/19]
Former International [2014/18]C08J5/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FORMMASSE, FORMVERFAHREN DAMIT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER FORMMASSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FASERVERSTÄRKTEN VERBUNDMASSE[2014/18]
English:MOLDING MATERIAL, MOLDING METHOD USING SAME, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDING MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL[2014/18]
French:MATIÈRE DE MOULAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE L'UTILISANT, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE MATIÈRE DE MOULAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE MATIÈRE COMPOSITE RENFORCÉE PAR DES FIBRES[2014/18]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2013Translation filed 
12.11.2013National basic fee paid 
12.11.2013Search fee paid 
12.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/18]
18.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2017Fee for grant paid
29.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
[2018/24]
Former [2018/22]FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NO11.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2508518  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [E] 8-10 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0108] *;
 [A]EP2138530  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure -; example - *;
 [A]EP0872521  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure - *;
 [A]US5264538  (MULLINS MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]  - CHEN M ET AL, "LARGE-SIZED MACROCYCLIC MONOMERIC PRECURSORS OF POLY(ETHER ETHER KETONE): SYNTHESIS AND POLYMERIZATION", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19960729), vol. 29, no. 16, doi:10.1021/MA9603589, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 5502 - 5504, XP000596760 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma9603589
 [A]  - CHEN C ET AL, "Polyether ketone kind rigid large ring monomer, polymer and synthesis method", WPI / THOMSON,, (20041222), vol. 2005, no. 24, XP002686384 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - CHEN T ET AL, "Method for synthesizing aromatic cyclic oligomer, utilizes the fried-craft acylation reaction under the condition of false high dilution, uses lewis acid of anhydrous aluminum nuriate as catalyst, uses lewis base of N-methyl pyrrolidine", WPI / THOMSON,, (20030924), vol. 2004, no. 25, XP002686385 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - XIE D ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND RING-OPENING POLYMERIZATION OF SINGLE-SIZED AROMATIC MACROCYCLES FOR POLY(RYLENE ETHER)S", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19970825), vol. 30, no. 17, doi:10.1021/MA970295+, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 4814 - 4827, XP000696087 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma970295+
 [A]  - VAN RIJSWIJK ET AL, "Reactive processing of textile fiber-reinforced thermoplastic composites - An overview", COMPOSITES PART A: APPLIED SCIENCE AND MANUFACTURING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20061215), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 1359-835X, pages 666 - 681, XP005805604 [A] 1-15 * 2.4.1 Polyetheretherketone (PEEK) *; page 673 *
International search[AP]WO2011081080  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al);
 [AE]WO2012081455  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2010095613  (KANEKA CORP);
 [A]JP2008231237  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [A]JPH06320536  (KOBE STEEL LTD)
by applicantJPH10138379
 JP2008231291
 JP2008231292
 JPH0388828
 JPH0539371
 JPH0925346
 JP2008231237
 JPH08118489
 JP2008231289
 JP3598510B
 JP2008231236
 JP2007506833