Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793700

EP2793700 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AT LEAST ONE TRANSIENT PHASE IN A STEADY ACTIVITY OF AN ANIMATED BEING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, Rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Movea
22, avenue Doyen Louis Weil
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2017/18]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Movea
22, avenue Doyen Louis Weil
38000 Grenoble / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MAYOUE, Aurélien
16 rue des Francs-Bourgeois
91450 Soisy Sur Seine / FR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Brunelli, Gérald
Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12805443.414.12.2012
[2017/18]
WO2012EP75503
Priority number, dateFR2011006186419.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161864
[2014/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092405
Date:27.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793700
Date:29.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793700
Date:03.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/11, A63B24/00, G06K9/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN VON MINDESTENS EINER ÜBERGANGSPHASE IN EINER KONSTANTEN AKTIVITÄT EINES ANIMIERTEN WESENS[2014/44]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AT LEAST ONE TRANSIENT PHASE IN A STEADY ACTIVITY OF AN ANIMATED BEING[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'AU MOINS UNE PHASE TRANSITOIRE DANS UNE ACTIVITÉ STATIONNAIRE D'UN ÊTRE ANIMÉ[2017/15]
Former [2014/44]SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'AU MOINS UNE PHASE TRANSITOIRE DANS UNE ACTIVITE STATIONNAIRE D'UN ETRE ANIME
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
30.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.02.2017Fee for grant paid
07.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2015
Opposition(s)06.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2012
AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
LU14.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2011012666  (MOVEA [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,5,10,12-14,16 * page 1, line 4 - page 1, line 23 * * page 2, line 19 - page 2, line 35 * * page 4, line 28 - page 8, line 12 * * figure 1 * [A] 6-9,15 [I] 2,3,11;
 [A]EP1870139  (IDT TECHNOLOGY LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0034] , [0040] * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO2010122173  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 17 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP2236987  (TANITA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0042] , [0043] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US6571193  (UNUMA MUNETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4932045
 US2007293374