blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2793700 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2793700



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 314
09.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
14.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
13.02.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
09.02.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
07.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.02.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
07.02.2017 Description Search / examination 1
07.02.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.02.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
11.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
16.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
16.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
16.02.2016 Description Search / examination 13
16.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.09.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
10.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
06.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
26.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.06.2014 Annex Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
21.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
14.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
14.12.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
14.12.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
14.12.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 13
14.12.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 8