blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2793700
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014343894Global Dossier 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP75503 14.12.2012
FR1161864 19.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2793700Global Dossier 03.05.2017B1
EP2793700 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP75503 14.12.2012
FR1161864 19.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013092405Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1161864 19.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2984511 05.12.2014B1
FR2984511 21.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1161864 19.12.2011