blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2780145 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2780145



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 344
16.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
01.06.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
06.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 45
21.07.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
27.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
02.06.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
02.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 16
30.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.10.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
18.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
18.07.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
03.07.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 60
12.06.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
24.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 7
23.05.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 46
28.11.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.11.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 3
28.11.2012 Description International Searching Authority 23
28.11.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 19