blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2780145


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
09.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
07.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.06.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.01.2017 Change - German title published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
27.01.2017 Change - English title published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
27.01.2017 Change - French title published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
20.01.2017 Change - inventor published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
20.01.2017 Change - German title published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
20.01.2017 Change - English title published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
20.01.2017 Change - French title published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
28.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
22.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
05.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
22.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication