blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2780145 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280065751 EP12805483



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9149967Global Dossier 06.10.2015B2
US2013122131 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213678116 15.11.2012
US201161560608 16.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6203739BGlobal Dossier 27.09.2017B2
JP2014533614 15.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US65400 16.11.2012
US201161560608 16.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104023937BGlobal Dossier 17.08.2016B
CN104023937 03.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US65400 16.11.2012
US201161560608 16.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2780145Global Dossier 12.07.2017B1
EP2780145 24.09.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2012US65400 16.11.2012
US201161560608 16.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013074858Global Dossier 18.07.2013A3
WO2013074858 23.05.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161560608 16.11.2011