Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2780145

EP2780145 - EXTRUSION DIES WITH EXTERNAL DECKLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/39]EXTRUSION DIES WITH INTERNAL AND/OR EXTERNAL DECKLES
[2017/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nordson Extrusion Dies Industries, LLC
911 Kurth Road
Chippewa Falls, Wisconsin 54729 / US
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / SEDIVY, Jordan, L.
1797 198th Street
Chippewa Falls, Wisconsin 54729 / US
02 / TRUSCOTT, Michael, K.
6430 191st Street
Chippewa Falls, Wisconsin 54729 / US
03 / PITSCH, Dale, P.
14228 Highway 178
Jim Falls, WI 54748 / US
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date12805483.016.11.2012
[2017/28]
WO2012US65400
Priority number, dateUS201161560608P16.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161560608 P
[2014/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013074858
Date:23.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2780145
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2780145
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/16, B29C47/08, B29C47/92
[2014/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRANGPRESSMATRIZEN MIT EXTERNEN LEISTEN[2017/09]
English:EXTRUSION DIES WITH EXTERNAL DECKLES[2017/09]
French:FILIÈRES D'EXTRUSION À RÉGLETTES EXTERNES[2017/09]
Former [2014/39]STRANGPRESSMATRIZEN MIT INNEREN UND/ODER ÄUSSEREN LEISTEN
Former [2014/39]EXTRUSION DIES WITH INTERNAL AND/OR EXTERNAL DECKLES
Former [2014/39]FILIÈRES D'EXTRUSION À RÉGLETTES INTERNES ET/OU EXTERNES
Entry into regional phase16.06.2014National basic fee paid 
16.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
06.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2017Fee for grant paid
01.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2017
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
GB16.11.2017
IE16.11.2017
LU16.11.2017
MT16.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/49]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE16.11.2017
LU16.11.2017
MT16.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE16.11.2017
LU16.11.2017
MT16.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
LU16.11.2017
MT16.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
LU16.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]JPH08142158  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 3,5,6;
 [XI]US2011206795  (ULCEJ JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 12,14,15,18,20 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * [I] 13,16,17,19;
 [A]US6017207  (DRUSCHEL ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1-17 *;
 [A]US2004056373  (ULCEJ JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1-22 *;
 [AP]DE102011002313  (FEUERHERM HARALD [DE]) [AP] 1-11 * figures 1-13 *;
 [XI]JP2002192594  (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [X] 12,14,17-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * figures 4-5 * [I] 13,16;
 [XI]US5679387  (CLOEREN PETER F [US], et al) [X] 12,14,15,20 * abstract * * claims 1-8 * * figures 3-5 * [I] 13,16
by applicantUS5830391