EP2785643 - STABILIZED MICROPOROUS CRYSTALLINE MATERIAL, THE METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME, AND THE USE FOR SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION OF NOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PQ Corporation P.O. Box 840 Valley Forge, PA 19482-0840 / US | [2020/27] |
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states PQ Corporation P.O. Box 840 Valley Forge, PA 19482-0840 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Hong-Xin 1048 Charter Oaks Drive Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 02 /
CORMIER, William E. 930 Masters Way Harleysville, Pennsylvania 19438 / US | 03 /
MODEN, Bjorn 232 S. Azalea Court Glen Mills, Pennsylvania 19342 / US | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2020/27] |
Former [2014/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12805498.8 | 30.11.2012 | [2020/27] | WO2012US67474 | Priority number, date | US201161566106P | 02.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161566106 P | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013082550 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2785643 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2785643 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/85, B01J35/02, C01B39/46, B01J29/70, B01J29/035, C01B39/02, C01B37/08, C01B39/54, B01J29/76 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
C01B37/08 (EP,US);
B01J29/88 (US);
B01D53/9418 (US);
B01J29/0356 (EP,US);
B01J29/072 (US);
B01J29/7065 (EP,US);
B01J29/763 (EP,US);
B01J29/83 (US);
B01J29/85 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
C01B39/02 (EP,US);
C01B39/026 (EP,US);
C01B39/54 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
B01D2251/208 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1085 (EP,US);
B01D2255/202 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2022 (EP,US);
B01D2255/204 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2045 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2047 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2063 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2066 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2068 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9205 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9207 (EP,US);
B01D53/58 (US);
B01J2229/183 (US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,US);
B01J2229/36 (EP,US);
C01B39/46 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/41] | C01B37/08, C01B39/54, C01B39/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | 22.05.2014 | ME | 22.05.2014 | Title | German: | STABILISIERTES MIKROPORÖSES KRISTALLINES MATERIAL, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN KATALYTISCHEN NOX-REDUKTION | [2014/41] | English: | STABILIZED MICROPOROUS CRYSTALLINE MATERIAL, THE METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME, AND THE USE FOR SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION OF NOX | [2014/41] | French: | MATÉRIAU CRISTALLIN MICROPOREUX STABILISÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI ET UTILISATION POUR LA RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE DE NOX | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 20.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2012 | AL | 01.07.2020 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | IE | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | LU | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.11.2012 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010121257 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 24 - page 26, line 5 *; | [A]EP2269733 (BASF SE [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0041] - [0184] *; | [XY]EP2308596 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030] - [0044] - [0072]; examples 2,3 * [Y] 15; | [XP]EP2428659 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0012] - [0026] - [0027] - [0035]; claims 1-15 *; | [Y] - AKOLEKAR D B ET AL, "NO and CO adsorption studies on transition metal-exchanged silico-aluminophosphate of type 34 catalysts", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 207, no. 1-2, ISSN 0926-860X, (20010201), pages 355 - 365, (20010201), XP027370714 [Y] 15 * column III, lines 1-17 * | Examination | US2013156668 | - Maggie Zamadics ET AL, "Effect of divalent cations on the location and coordination of copper(II) ions in SAPO-42 molecular sieve", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (19930401), vol. 97, no. 13, doi:10.1021/j100115a045, ISSN 0022-3654, pages 3359 - 3364, XP055381581 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j100115a045 |