Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791111

EP2791111 - [4-(PIPERIDIN-4-YL)-NAPHTHALEN-2-YL]-ACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES AS CRTH2 ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/43]PIPERIDINYL NAPHTHYLACETIC ACIDS
[2016/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2017/03]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FIROOZNIA, Fariborz
9 Pierson Lane, Florham Park
New Jersey 07932 / US
02 / LIN, Tai-An
83 Mandeville Avenue
Pequannock, New Jersey 07440 / US
03 / MERTZ, Eric
5-25 3rd Street
Fair Lawn New Jersey 07039 / US
04 / SIDDURI, Achyutharao
22 Washington Court
Livingston, New Jersey 07039 / US
05 / SO, Sung-Sau
11 Westover Road
Verona, New Jersey 07044 / US
06 / TILLEY, Jefferson Wright
19 Evergreen Drive
North Caldwell, New Jersey 07006 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Schirlin, Julien , et al
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
CLP - Patent Department
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12805511.810.12.2012
[2017/03]
WO2012EP74882
Priority number, dateUS201161569313P12.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161569313 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087544
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791111
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2791111
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D211/18, C07D211/96, A61K31/451, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P11/08
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:[4-(PIPERIDIN-4-YL)-NAPHTHALEN-2-YL]-ESSIGSÄUREDERIVATE ALS CRTH2-ANTAGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN[2016/36]
English:[4-(PIPERIDIN-4-YL)-NAPHTHALEN-2-YL]-ACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES AS CRTH2 ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY DISORDERS[2016/36]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE L'ACIDE ACÉTIQUE [4-(PIPERIDIN-4-YL)-NAPHTHALEN-2-YL] EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES CRTH2 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES RESPIRATOIRES[2016/36]
Former [2014/43]PIPERIDINYL-NAPHTHYLESSIGSÄUREN
Former [2014/43]PIPERIDINYL NAPHTHYLACETIC ACIDS
Former [2014/43]ACIDES PIPÉRIDINYLNAPHTYLACÉTIQUES
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
23.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2016Fee for grant paid
01.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2015
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.12.2012
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU10.12.2012
AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2019/30]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010055006  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-22 * examples 3-1 to 6-5 * * page 81 - page 85 * * claims 1,2,25 *
by applicant   - NAGATA ET AL., FEBS LETT, vol. 459, 1999, pages 195 - 199
    - HIRAI ET AL., J EXP MED, vol. 193, 2001, pages 255 - 261
    - GERVAIS ET AL., JALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, vol. 108, 2001, pages 982 - 988
    - XUE ET AL., J IMMUNOL, vol. 175, pages 6531 - 6536
    - YOSHIMURA-UCHIYAMA ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, vol. 34, pages 1283 - 1290
    - HUANG ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, vol. 13, 2004, pages 2691 - 2697
    - COSMI ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, vol. 30, 2000, pages 2972 - 2979
    - "Fieser and Fieser's Reagents for Organic Synthesis", vol. 1-15, 1991, WILEY & SONS
    - "Rodd's Chemistry of Carbon Compounds", vol. 1-5, 1989, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS
    - "Organic Reactions", vol. 1-40, 1991, WILEY & SONS
    - DIAN, Y. L. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., vol. 32, 1991, pages 5255
    - HONG, W. P.; LIM, H. N.; PARK, H. W.; LEE, K.-J., BULL. KOREAN CHEM. SOC., vol. 26, 2005, pages 655
    - CHAN W. K ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., vol. 39, 1996, pages 3756 - 3768
    - KOZHINOV, D. V. ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., vol. 69, 2004, pages 1378 - 1379
    - CHAN W. K. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., vol. 39, 1996, pages 3756 - 3768
    - BLOOMER, J. L.; STAGLIANO, K. W.; GAZZILLO, J. A., J. ORG. CHEM., vol. 58, 1993, pages 7906
    - HONG, W. P.; LIM, H. N.; PARK, H. W.; LEE, K.-J, BULL. KOREAN CHEM. SOC., vol. 26, 2005, pages 655
    - SCHOENBERG, A.; BARTOLETTI, 1.; HECK, R. F., J. ORG. CHEM., vol. 39, 1974, pages 3318
    - VANKAR, Y. D.; RAO, T. J., CHEM. RESEARCH, 1985, pages 232
 US20060094365
 US20120447809