Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783201

EP2783201 - METHOD FOR SENSOR CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.11.2017  [2017/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Episentec AB
Fjällvägen 6B
191 46 Sollentuna / SE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / HANNING, Anders
Fjällvägen 6B
S-191 46 Sollentuna / SE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Kånge, Lars Rikard
Awapatent AB
Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12805603.313.11.2012
WO2012EP72512
Priority number, dateSE2011005111022.11.2011         Original published format: SE 1151110
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013075979
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783201
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/27, G01N21/41, G01N21/55, G01N33/543
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SENSORKALIBRIERUNG[2014/40]
English:METHOD FOR SENSOR CALIBRATION[2014/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE DE CAPTEUR[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2014National basic fee paid 
09.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
01.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/45]
28.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010332174  (TRACY DAVID H [US]) [A] 1-33 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0152]; figure 7 *;
 [XP]WO2011147879  (EPISENTEC AB [SE]; HANNING ANDERS [SE]) [XP] 1-33 * the whole document *
 [I]  - RAJAN JHA ET AL, "Design considerations for plasmonic-excitation based optical detection of liquid and gas media in infrared", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 165, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.SNA.2010.10.021, ISSN 0924-4247, (20101031), pages 271 - 275, (20101109), XP028357839 [I] 1-33 * paragraph [0002] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2010.10.021
 [I]  - NAVINA MEHAN ET AL, "Surface plasmon resonance based refractive index sensor for liquids", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PURE AND APPLIED PHYSICS CSIR INDIA, (200511), vol. 43, no. 11, ISSN 0019-5596, pages 854 - 858, XP055055654 [I] 1-33 * figures 2-7 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] *
 [A]  - HANNING A ET AL, "Enhanced sensitivity of wavelength modulated surface plasmon resonance devices using dispersion from a dye solution", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER S.A, SWITZERLAND, vol. 54, no. 1-2, ISSN 0925-4005, (19990125), pages 25 - 36, (19990125), XP027370041 [A] 1-33 * paragraph [003.] - paragraph [005.] *
by applicantUS5573956
 US5641640
 JPH11118802
 WO02073171
 JP2002090291
 JP2002357536
 JP2003215029
    - J. HOMOLA, CHEM. REV., (2008), vol. 108, page 462
    - H. KANO; S. KAWATA, APPL. OPT., (1994), vol. 33, page 5166
    - S.R. KARLSEN ET AL., SENS. ACTUATORS B, (1995), vol. 747, pages 24 - 25
    - Z. SALAMON ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1997), vol. 1331, page 117
    - A.A. KOLOMENSKII ET AL., APPL. OPT., (2000), vol. 39, page 3314
    - S. WANG ET AL., REV. SCI. INSTR., (2001), vol. 72, page 3055
    - S. EKGASIT ET AL., SENS. ACTUATORS B, (2005), vol. 105, page 532
    - Y. HUR ET AL., ANAL. CHIM. ACTA, (2002), vol. 460, page 133
    - P. UZNANSKI; J. PECHERZ, J. APPL. POL. SCI., (2002), vol. 86, page 1459
    - H. KOMATSU ET AL., SCI. TECH. ADV. MATER., (2006), vol. 7, page 150
    - M. NAKKACH ET AL., APPL. OPT., (2008), vol. 47, page 6177
    - O. ESTEBAN ET AL., OPT. LETT., (2006), vol. 31, page 3089
    - R. KARLSSON, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 221, page 142
    - R. KARLSSON; A. FALT, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 200, page 121