Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785717

EP2785717 - PYRAZOLOPYRROLIDINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / FURET, Pascal
Novartis Pharma AG
Werk Klybeck
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
02 / GUAGNANO, Vito
Novartis Pharma AG
Werk Klybeck
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
03 / HOLZER, Philipp
Novartis Pharma AG
Werk Klybeck
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
04 / MAH, Robert
Novartis Pharma AG
Werk Klybeck
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
05 / MASUYA, Keiichi
Novartis Pharma AG
Werk Klybeck
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
06 / SCHLAPBACH, Achim
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
07 / STUTZ, Stefan
Novartis Pharma AG
Werk Klybeck
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
08 / VAUPEL, Andrea
Novartis Pharma AG
Werk Klybeck
Postfach
CH-4002 Basel / CH
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Strang, Andrea Josephine , et al
Novartis Pharma AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2016/02]
Former [2014/41]Hodge, Emma Jane
Novartis Pharmaceuticals AG
Patent Department
Posfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date12805775.928.11.2012
[2016/02]
WO2012IB56796
Priority number, dateUS201161564591P29.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161564591 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080141
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785717
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785717
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/04, A61K31/4162, A61K31/513, A61K31/506, A61K31/4439, A61P35/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PYRAZOLOPYRROLIDINVERBINDUNGEN[2014/41]
English:PYRAZOLOPYRROLIDINE COMPOUNDS[2014/41]
French:COMPOSÉS PYRAZOLOPYRROLIDINE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
15.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2015Fee for grant paid
27.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2015
Opposition(s)14.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.11.2012
AL13.01.2016
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU28.11.2012
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2018/30]HU28.11.2012
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SE13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL13.01.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2011076786  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-17 * Compounds of examples.; page 2, paragraph 3; claims 1,12-15 *;
 [A]WO2010141738  (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * compound LDN-0161044 in Figure 29; page 1 *;
 [A]WO2007068637  (NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-17 * Compounds of examples.;; claims 1,14-17 *
by applicantWO2011076786
 WO2004078163
 US4659516
 US4636505
 US4100274
 US5843901
 WO9917804
 US5010099
 WO9810121
 US6194181
 WO9825929
 WO9808849
 WO9943653
 WO9822461
 WO0031247
 WO02092599
 US5093330
 WO0009495
 WO9702266
 EP0564409
 WO9903854
 EP0520722
 EP0566226
 EP0787722
 EP0837063
 US5747498
 WO9810767
 WO9730034
 WO9749688
 WO9738983
 WO9630347
 WO9633980
 WO9503283
 WO03013541
 FR901228
 WO0222577
 US6552065
 US5461076
 WO9835958
 WO0027820
 WO0059509
 WO9811223
 WO0027819
 EP0769947
 WO0037502
 WO9410202
 DE1931193
 WO2007107470
    - MATLASHEWSKI ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 3257 - 62
    - KAGHAD ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 90, pages 809 - 19
    - YANG ET AL., MOL CELL, (1998), vol. 2, pages 305 - 16
    - PIETENPOL ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 1998 - 2002
    - FAKHARZADEH ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 1565 - 9
    - SHVARTS ET AL., GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 43, pages 34 - 42
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PRINTING COMPANY, (1990), pages 1289 - 1329
    - "Principles of Radiation Therapy, Cancer", HELLMAN ET AL., Principles and Practice of Oncology, (1993), vol. 1, pages 248 - 275
    - NANDY ET AL., ACTA ONCOLOGICA, (1994), vol. 33, no. 8, pages 953 - 961
    - PREWETT ET AL., CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 59, pages 5209 - 5218
    - YUAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 14765 - 14770
    - ZHU ET AL., CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 58, pages 3209 - 3214
    - MORDENTI ET AL., TOXICOL PATHOL, (1999), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 14 - 21
    - O'REILLY ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 79, pages 315 - 328
    - O'REILLY ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 88, pages 277 - 285
    - The Merck Index, IMS WORLD PUBLICATIONS
    - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methods of Organic Synthesis, THIEME, (1952), vol. 21
    - A. KLAPARS; XIAOHUA HUANG; S. L. BUCHWALD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, page 7421
    - ALTMAN, J. WILCHEK, M. JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 915 - 916
    - SCAPENS, D.; ADAMS, H.; JOHNSON, T. R.; MANN, B. E.; SAWLE, P.; AQIL, R.; PERRIOR, T.; MOTTERLINI, R., DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (2007), vol. 43, pages 4962 - 4973