Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789195

EP2789195 - USING WIRELESS WIDE AREA NETWORK PROTOCOL INFORMATION FOR MANAGING A PERFORMANCE LEVEL OF A PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / JIM, Samson
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / KLINGENBRUNN, Thomas
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / HSU, Chih-ping
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / SHAH, Chaitanya, Bhartan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / AZIZ, Farhan, Muhammad
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
06 / EHSAN, Navid
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2015/35]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2014/42]Roche, Dermot , et al
Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date12805855.905.12.2012
[2015/35]
WO2012US68036
Priority number, dateUS20111331199706.12.2011         Original published format: US201113311997
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086051
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789195
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789195
Date:26.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON WWAN-PROTOKOLLINFORMATIONEN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES LEISTUNGSNIVEAUS EINES PROZESSORS[2014/42]
English:USING WIRELESS WIDE AREA NETWORK PROTOCOL INFORMATION FOR MANAGING A PERFORMANCE LEVEL OF A PROCESSOR[2014/42]
French:UTILISATION DE DONNÉES DE PROTOCOLE DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL ÉTENDU POUR GÉRER UN NIVEAU DE PERFORMANCE D'UN PROCESSEUR[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2014National basic fee paid 
14.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
19.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2015Fee for grant paid
15.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2015
Opposition(s)30.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.12.2012
AL26.08.2015
AT26.08.2015
BE26.08.2015
BG26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
MT26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
TR26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU05.12.2012
AT26.08.2015
BE26.08.2015
BG26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
MT26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
TR26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2018/31]HU05.12.2012
AT26.08.2015
BE26.08.2015
BG26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MK26.08.2015
MT26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU05.12.2012
AT26.08.2015
BE26.08.2015
BG26.08.2015
CY26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
MT26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
SM26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/03]AT26.08.2015
BE26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/50]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IE05.12.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
LU05.12.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
MC26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
IT26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/14]AT26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NL26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT26.08.2015
ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT26.08.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010069128  (CHENG STEVEN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,10-13,25-29,36-38,46 * the whole document * [I] 3-9,14-24,30-35,39-45;
 [A]US7073079  (KARSI MURAT F [US] ET AL) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008291838  (JAAKKOLA MIKKO [FI] ET AL) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *