Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789189

EP2789189 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PERFORMING HANDOVER OF USER EQUIPMENT BETWEEN DIFFERENT RADIO ACCESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / KAPOOR, Rohit
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / MOHANTY, Bibhu, Prasad
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12805864.106.12.2012
WO2012US68306
Priority number, dateUS201161567549P06.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567549 P
US20121370585105.12.2012         Original published format: US201213705851
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086237
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789189
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/14, H04W36/00, // H04W36/24
[2017/11]
Former International [2014/42]H04W36/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERGABE EINES BENUTZERGERÄTES ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN FUNKZUGANGSNETZWERKEN[2014/42]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PERFORMING HANDOVER OF USER EQUIPMENT BETWEEN DIFFERENT RADIO ACCESS NETWORKS[2014/42]
French:APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR EXÉCUTER UN TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR ENTRE DES RÉSEAUX D'ACCÈS RADIO DIFFÉRENTS[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
05.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/02]
28.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/02]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010088956  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,9-11,19,26-28 * figure 4 * * page 4, lines 31-36 * * page 9, lines 30-35 * * page 12, line 4 - page 14, line 5 * [I] 2-8,12-18,20-25,29-34;
 [XI]US2004255331  (INOUE AKINO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9-11,19,26-28 * paragraphs [0042] - [0069] * [I] 2-8,12-18,20-25,29-34