Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782462

EP2782462 - SMOKING ARTICLE WITH MOVABLE VAPOUR RELEASE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / DINCER, Ahmet
Av. Des Figuiers 37
1007 Lausanne / CH
02 / UTHURRY, Jerome
Route des Falaises 66
2000 Neuchatel / CH
03 / KADIRIC, Alen
Schwadernauweg 33
2504 Bienne / CH
04 / HOUPHOUET-BOIGNY, Chrystele
Route des Flumeaux 20
1008 Prilly / CH
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Civera, Andrea
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Civera, Andrea
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date12805947.407.11.2012
WO2012EP72028
Priority number, dateEP2011025088607.11.2011         Original published format: EP 11250886
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013068398
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782462
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A24D3/04
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:RAUCHARTIKEL MIT BEWEGLICHER RAUCHFREISETZUNGSKOMPONENTE[2018/19]
English:SMOKING ARTICLE WITH MOVABLE VAPOUR RELEASE COMPONENT[2014/40]
French:ARTICLE À FUMER DOTÉ D'UN COMPOSANT DE LIBÉRATION DE VAPEUR AMOVIBLE[2018/19]
Former [2014/40]RAUCHARTIKEL MIT EINER BEWEGLICHEN RAUCHFREISETZUNGSKOMPONENTE
Former [2014/40]ARTICLE À FUMER DOTÉ D'UN COMPOSANT DE LIBÉRATION DE VAPEUR MOBILE
Entry into regional phase05.06.2014National basic fee paid 
05.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
24.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0671131  (ROTHMANS INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,7-10,14,15 * page 3, lines 4-35; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 * [Y] 11;
 [Y]US4716912  (LEONARD GERARD E [US]) [Y] 11 * column 1, lines 6-8 * * column 5, lines 8-12 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]USRE32221E  (JOHN M ADAMS) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0630587  (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantWO2008121610
 WO2010107613