Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779914

EP2779914 - APPARATUS FOR TENSIONING A SUTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/39]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TENSIONING A SUTURE
[2017/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, BE
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Sports Medicine, LLC
56 E. Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2018/17]
Former [2014/39]For all designated states
Biomet Sports Medicine, LLC
56 E. Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DENHAM, Gregory J.
3348 North Hickory Court
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / STONE, Kevin T.
2615 Harmony Ct.
Winona Lake, Indiana 46590 / US
03 / WACK, Michael A.
2028 W. Smith St.
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/17]
Former [2014/39]Giles, Ashley Simon
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date12806211.413.11.2012
[2018/17]
WO2012US64832
Priority number, dateUS20111329512614.11.2011         Original published format: US201113295126
[2014/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013074525
Date:23.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2779914
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2779914
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2014/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPANNUNG EINER NAHT[2017/45]
English:APPARATUS FOR TENSIONING A SUTURE[2017/45]
French:APPAREIL DE MISE SOUS TENSION D'UNE SUTURE[2017/45]
Former [2014/39]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPANNUNG EINER NAHT
Former [2014/39]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TENSIONING A SUTURE
Former [2014/39]MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL DE MISE SOUS TENSION D'UNE SUTURE
Entry into regional phase11.06.2014National basic fee paid 
11.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
13.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2018Fee for grant paid
13.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2015
Opposition(s)28.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.04.2018
AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
FR30.11.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
FR30.11.2018
Former [2019/48]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
Former [2019/34]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
LU13.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/03]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
Former [2018/51]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/50]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/49]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/47]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL25.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011245868  (TEESLINK REX [US] ET AL) [X] 1-9,15-17,21,22,35,36,38,44-58 * paragraphs [0093] - [0094]; figures 14-15 * [I] 10,29-34;
 [X]WO2007103562  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]; ZOLLINGER CHRISTOPHER J [US]; ADZICH V) [X] 1,7-9,15,19,35 * paragraphs [0041] - [0042]; figures 3-4 *;
 [A]US2004225183  (MICHLITSCH KEN [US] ET AL MICHLITSCH KENNETH J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-58 * paragraphs [0105] - [0110]; figures 7-9 *
ExaminationWO2007119057
by applicantUS20060541506