Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785803

EP2785803 - METHOD OF MITIGATING ICE BUILD-UP ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2019New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
14.03.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MORAVEK, Scott J.
153 Briarwood Lane
Cranberry Township, Pennsylvania 16066 / US
02 / RAKIEWICZ, Edward F.
1193 Woodhill Drive
Gibsonia, Pennsylvania 15044 / US
03 / SCHWARTZMILLER, Davina J.
2339 Linwood Drive
Allison Park, Pennsylvania 15101 / US
04 / ZALICH, Michael A.
708 Duncan Avenue
Apartment 1119
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15237 / US
05 / VALENTA, Jane N.
7437 Ben Hur Street
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15208 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12806238.730.11.2012
[2016/37]
WO2012US67262
Priority number, dateUS201161566077P02.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161566077 P
US20121368864829.11.2012         Original published format: US201213688648
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082405
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785803
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785803
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/00, C09K3/18
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER EISBILDUNG AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT[2014/41]
English:METHOD OF MITIGATING ICE BUILD-UP ON A SUBSTRATE[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE LIMITER L'ACCUMULATION DE GLACE SUR UN SUBSTRAT[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
31.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2016Fee for grant paid
04.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2017  19.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Jotun A/S
P.O. Box 2021
3202 Sandefjord / NO
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [2018/27]
Former [2017/29]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2017   
Jotun A/S
P.O. Box 2021
3202 Sandefjord / NO
Opponent's representative
Campbell, Neil Boyd
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
21.07.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.11.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.03.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2012
AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU30.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU30.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU30.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/43]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/35]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT14.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2012065828  (BASF COATINGS GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 5, line 13 - page 8, line 25 * * examples 1-10; claims 1-3,9-11,14,15 *;
 [X]WO2009115079  (NANO X GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 8 - page 6, line 6 * * examples 1-6; claims 1-4,6-8,10-13,22-26 *;
 [X]WO2007013761  (POSCO [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0025] * * examples I, II; claims 1,2,10-14 *;
 [X]WO2006006402  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5618860
 US5275645
OppositionWO02059210
 US5804616
 US5618860
    - "EPON™ Resin 862", HEXION Technical Data Sheet, (20050300), pages 1 - 5, XP055391661
    - "High-solids curing agents for ambient-cure coatings", European Coatings, (19980501), XP055391664