Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792212

EP2792212 - INDUCTION COOKING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Premark FEG L.L.C.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, IL 60025 / US
[2015/43]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Premark FEG L.L.C.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview IL 60025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GULKANAT, Bektas, C.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/23]Trinks, Ole
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Former [2014/43]Trinks, Ole
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
P.O. Box 102605
86016 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date12806278.310.12.2012
[2016/23]
WO2012US68669
Priority number, dateUS201161570528P14.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161570528 P
US20121367933116.11.2012         Original published format: US201213679331
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013090160
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2792212
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792212
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/12, H05B6/06, H05B6/10
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INDUKTIONSKOCHGERÄT[2015/39]
English:INDUCTION COOKING APPARATUS[2014/43]
French:APPAREIL DE CUISSON À INDUCTION[2014/43]
Former [2014/43]INDUKTIONSKOCHVORRICHTUNG
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
24.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2015Fee for grant paid
14.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2015
Opposition(s)09.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.12.2012
AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
TR08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB10.12.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU10.12.2012
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
TR08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB10.12.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU10.12.2012
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB10.12.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/38]HU10.12.2012
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB10.12.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU10.12.2012
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB10.12.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
GB10.12.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010116820  (PAN CHIH-JUNG [TW] ET AL) [X] 1,2,15,18 * the whole document * [I] 3-8,16,17,19;
 [A]DE202008005483U  (TSANN KUEN CHINA ENTPR CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-8,15-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0787454  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-8,15-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0677980  (ELECTROLUX THERMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8,15-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2726149  (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1-8,15-19 * the whole document *