Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793954

EP2793954 - 18F - FLUCICLOVINE COMPOSITIONS IN CITRATE BUFFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Healthcare Limited
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
GE Healthcare Limited
Amersham Place Little Chalfont
Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ROMOREN, Kristine
GE Healthcare AS
Nycoveien 2
Postboks 4220 Nydalen
0401 Oslo / NO
02 / RYAN, Olav
Algeta ASA
P.O. Box 54 Kjelsas
0411 Olso / NO
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Bannan, Sally , et al
GE Healthcare Limited
Intellectual Property
Pollards Wood
Nightingales Lane
Chalfont St.Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Bannan, Sally , et al
GE Healthcare Limited
Intellectual Property
Pollards Wood
Nightingales Lane, Chalfont St Giles
Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB
Application number, filing date12806500.021.12.2012
WO2012EP76689
Priority number, dateWO2011EP7367021.12.2011         Original published format: PCT/EP2011/073670
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093025
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793954
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K51/04, A61K101/02
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:18F-FLUCICLOVINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN IN CITRATPUFFERN[2014/44]
English:18F - FLUCICLOVINE COMPOSITIONS IN CITRATE BUFFERS[2014/44]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE 18F-FLUCICLOVINE DANS DES TAMPONS CITRATE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2014National basic fee paid 
04.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
09.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[ID]EP2119458  (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) [ID] 1-21 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0025] , [0032] - [0036] - [0052] , [0059] , [0060] , [0064] * * claim 4 *
by applicantWO2004043497
 EP2080526
 EP2119458
    - AIGBIRHIO ET AL., J FLUOR CHEM, (1995), vol. 70, pages 279 - 87
    - MCCONATHY ET AL., APPL RADIAT ISOTOP, (2003), vol. 58, pages 657 - 666
    - SHOUP; GOODMAN, J LABEL COMP RADIOPHARM, (1999), vol. 42, pages 215 - 225
    - MCCONATHY; 2003 ET AL., APPL RADIAT ISOTOP, vol. 58, pages 657 - 666
    - SATYAMURTHY ET AL., CLIN POSITR IMAG, (1999), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 233 - 253
 WO2012EP75829