Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2793954


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.08.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.05.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.01.2018 First examination report
05.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
10.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication