Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2793954 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180063488 CN201280063530 CN201810077584 CN201811258984 EP11808853 EP12806500



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013093025Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012089594Global Dossier 05.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019192660Global Dossier 27.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201414367649 20.06.2014
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
US201061427839 29.12.2010
US201916288650 28.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015231249Global Dossier 20.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013324715Global Dossier 05.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113997808 21.12.2011
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190119673Global Dossier 22.10.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190008994Global Dossier 25.01.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140102700Global Dossier 22.08.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20130132892Global Dossier 05.12.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6446268BGlobal Dossier 26.12.2018B2
JP2015500865 08.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6018581BGlobal Dossier 02.11.2016B2
JP2014508731 10.04.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2658831Global Dossier 15.02.2017B1
EP2658831 06.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109966515Global Dossier 05.07.2019A
Priority number Date
CN201280063530 21.12.2012
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108218650Global Dossier 29.06.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201180063488 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103998065Global Dossier 20.08.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103270004Global Dossier 28.08.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2793954Global Dossier 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
EP12806500 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011351550B 02.02.2017B2
AU2011351550 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012356846B 27.07.2017B2
AU2012356846 05.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013015396 20.09.2016A2
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014015042 04.07.2017A8
BR112014015042 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2011EP93670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2823063 05.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2853415 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2658831T 24.04.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2621950T 05.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2509476 08.08.2018B
GB2509476 02.07.2014A
GB201408239D 25.06.2014D0
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL232397 29.12.2016A
IL232397D 30.06.2014D0
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN3245DELNP2014 10.07.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX363538 27.03.2019B
MX2013007699 15.08.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ624250 24.06.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2658831T 31.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
EP11808853 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2608932 26.01.2017C2
RU2013126979 20.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2623163 22.06.2017C2
RU2014118755 10.02.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG10201805198T 30.07.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
US201061427839 29.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201403412Y 30.07.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011EP73670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201404932 24.04.2019B
Priority number Date
EP11073670 21.12.2011
WO2012EP76689 21.12.2012