Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785344

EP2785344 - PHACETOPERANE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ATTENTION-DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.10.2017  [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NLS Pharma AG
Breitenweg 10
6370 Stans / CH
[2016/43]
Former [2016/31]For all designated states
NLS-1 Pharma AG
Breitenweg 10
6370 Stans / CH
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Assistance Publique Hôpitaux De Paris
3 Avenue Victoria
75004 Paris 4 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / KONOFAL, Eric
12 place Henri IV
F-60300 Senlis / FR
02 / FIGADERE, Bruno
17 rue paul Payenneville
F-91530 Saint Cheron / FR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Chajmowicz, Marion , et al
Becker & Associés
25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12806593.529.11.2012
[2016/44]
WO2012FR52749
Priority number, dateFR2011006090229.11.2011         Original published format: FR 1160902
[2014/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079873
Date:06.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785344
Date:08.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785344
Date:02.11.2016
Language:FR
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4458, A61P25/00
[2016/22]
Former International [2014/41]A61K31/4458, A61P25/00, C07D211/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHACETOPERAN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUFMERKSAMKEITSDEFIZITSTÖRUNG MIT HYPERAKTIVITÄT[2014/41]
English:PHACETOPERANE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ATTENTION-DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER[2014/41]
French:PHACETOPERANE POUR TRAITER UN TROUBLE DEFICIT DE L'ATTENTION HYPERACTIVITE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
06.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2016Fee for grant paid
23.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16195856.6  / EP3153168
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2016
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[ID]US2928835  (MICHEL JACOB ROBERT ET AL) [ID] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - LEITCH A ET AL, "A trial of pour anti-depressant drugs", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1963), Database accession no. EMB-0007593501, XP002676742 [I] 1-8 * abstract *
    [ ] - LEITCH A ET AL, "A trial of pour anti-depressant drugs", PSYCHOPHARMACOLXXIIA 1963, (1963), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 72 - 77
by applicantUS2928835