Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2776188

EP2776188 - CENTRIFUGAL CASTING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Embraco Europe S.r.l.
Piazza Solferino 20
10121 Torino / IT
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / MARINO, Michele
Corso Tortona 9
I-10153 Torino / IT
02 / FEROLETO, Mauro
Corso Venezia 108
I-14100 Asti / IT
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Gerbino, Angelo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
[2015/37]
Former [2014/38]Gerbino, Angelo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date12806671.907.11.2012
[2015/37]
WO2012IB56207
Priority number, dateIT2011TO0103209.11.2011         Original published format: IT TO20111032
[2014/38]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013068930
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2776188
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2776188
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B22D13/10, B22D17/00, B22D13/04, B22D19/00, H02K17/16
[2015/13]
Former International [2014/38]B22D13/10, B22D17/00, B22D13/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHLEUDERGIESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2014/38]
English:CENTRIFUGAL CASTING APPARATUS AND METHOD[2014/38]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COULÉE CENTRIFUGE[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
18.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2015Fee for grant paid
24.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2015
Opposition(s)10.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.11.2012
AL09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2017/39]HU07.11.2012
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
Former [2016/28]EE09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
Former [2016/23]EE09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
Former [2016/21]IT09.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO03097274  (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR], et al) [AD] 1-10 * page 3, lines 5-23 * * paragraph [Object.of.the.invention] * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 3 * * paragraph [Descr.of.the.illustrated.Embodiment] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO03049886  (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [Summary.of.the.invention] * * figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US2005184430  (FEICK MURRAY [CA]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-40; claims 1-14 * * paragraph [Summary.of.the.invention] *
by applicantWO03097274