Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789055

EP2789055 - CONNECTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2016  [2016/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / TASHIRO, Harunori
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
653-2 Osaka
Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1421 / JP
02 / SUZUKI, Tomoharu
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
653-2 Osaka
Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1421 / JP
03 / ISHIKAWA, Ayumu
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
653-2 Osaka
Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1421 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12806715.406.12.2012
WO2012JP07821
Priority number, dateJP2011026916408.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011269164
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084493
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789055
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/52, H01R43/24, H01R105/00, H01R4/18
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:STECKVERBINDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/42]
English:CONNECTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF[2014/42]
French:CONNECTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
01.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/15]
08.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2004235364  (MATSUMOTO MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-5 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US2011034089  (NAGASHIMA SHINYU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 2,8 *;
 [A]US3806766  (FANNING W) [A] 1-5 * figures 3,8-10 *;
 [A]EP1487248  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US2009258521  (OOKI YUUSAKU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figure 6 *
by applicantJP2004349026