Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789125

EP2789125 - MODELLING OF A DISTRIBUTED INTERNET PROTOCOL NETWORK ANALYSIS FLOW BASED ON PERFORMANCE CONSTRAINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2018/20]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / FAN, John
41644 Chiltern Drive
Fremont, California 94539 / US
02 / LIN, Chuhyu
1198 Nikette Way
San Jose, California 95120 / US
03 / CHU, Ronald
457 W. Meadow Drive
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
04 / WEIGT, George
3595 Granada Avenue
Unit 390
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
05 / CHIEN, Fangli
6934 Windsor Way
San Jose, California 95129 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12806798.008.12.2012
[2018/20]
WO2012US68641
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014088599
Date:12.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789125
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789125
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L12/26, G06F11/34, G06F9/44
[2017/49]
Former International [2014/42]H04L12/24, H04L12/26, G06F11/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MODELLIERUNG EINES VERTEILTEN INTERNETPROTOKOLLNETZWERK-ANALYSEFLUSSES BASIEREND AUF LEISTUNGSEINSCHRÄNKUNGEN[2014/42]
English:MODELLING OF A DISTRIBUTED INTERNET PROTOCOL NETWORK ANALYSIS FLOW BASED ON PERFORMANCE CONSTRAINTS[2014/42]
French:MODÉLISATION D'UN FLUX D'ANALYSE DE RÉSEAU DE TYPE PROTOCOLE INTERNET DISTRIBUÉ REPOSANT SUR DES CONTRAINTES DE PERFORMANCES[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
26.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2015/40]
26.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2018Fee for grant paid
28.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2015
Opposition(s)19.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
LU08.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
LU08.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
NO16.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005049924  (DEBETTENCOURT JASON [US] ET AL) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0118] *;
 [IA]WO2006130667  (MATHWORKS INC [US]; CIOLFI JOHN [US]) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 2 * * page 11, line 25 - page 13, line 20 * * page 17, line 5 - page 23, line 3 * * figures 2A-5 * * claims 1-11 * [A] 6-18;
 [IA]US2012239799  (WANG CHENGWEI [US] ET AL) [I] 6-12 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,13-18;
 [IA]US2011145286  (LAROWE GAVIN H [US] ET AL) [I] 13-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * [A] 1-12
International search[A]US2005049924  (DEBETTENCOURT JASON [US] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0118] *;
 [A]US2009222782  (BAYATI MOHSEN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2006130667
 US2012239799
 US2011145286