blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2829021 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2829021



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 344
11.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.06.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
11.06.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
11.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
14.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 36
20.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
12.10.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
09.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.10.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.08.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
28.08.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
24.08.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 15
23.08.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 26
18.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.06.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.05.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.05.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
24.04.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.04.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 5
30.03.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 20
20.09.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
16.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.05.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
05.04.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 10
14.01.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.10.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
05.09.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 38
28.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
28.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
07.02.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
21.12.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
21.12.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 4
21.12.2012 Description International Searching Authority 29
21.12.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
21.12.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 4