blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2829021


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.06.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.01.2019 Change - classification published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
02.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.10.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.08.2018 Change - applicant published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
27.06.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2018 First examination report
03.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.05.2017 Change - representative
21.04.2017 Change - applicant published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
23.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2016 Change - representative
18.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
15.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
18.10.2014 Change - representative
18.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication