blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2829021 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280071625 EP12806817



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9722894Global Dossier 01.08.2017B2
US2015012648 08.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US69070 12.12.2012
US201261613527 21.03.2012
US201214382938 12.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140138785Global Dossier 04.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US69070 12.12.2012
US201261613527 21.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6250627BGlobal Dossier 20.12.2017B2
JP2015515797 28.05.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012US69070 12.12.2012
US201261613527 21.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104221329BGlobal Dossier 30.04.2019B
CN104221329 17.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US69070 12.12.2012
US201261613527 21.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2829021Global Dossier 28.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US69070 12.12.2012
US201261613527 21.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013141909Global Dossier 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261613527 21.03.2012