blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2829021

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure11.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase17.10.2014National basic fee paid 
17.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted24.07.2019
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.01.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:28.01.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20141017
 
Event date:28.01.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:24.05.2017 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:THOMSON LICENSING DTV
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20180618
 
Event date:03.10.2018 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:INTERDIGITAL MADISON PATENT HOLDINGS
 
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04L 12/26 20060101ALN20190109BHEP
 
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04L 12/28 20060101AFI20190109BHEP
 
Event date:13.03.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190214