Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829021

EP2829021 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING OPERATIONAL STATUS FOR MULTIPLE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2018/40]
Former [2017/21]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing DTV
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / TESTIN, William
6808 Winona Drive
Indianapolis, Indiana 46236 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2019/30]
Former [2015/05]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12806817.812.12.2012
[2019/30]
WO2012US69070
Priority number, dateUS201261613527P21.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261613527 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141909
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829021
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2829021
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, // H04L12/26
[2019/07]
Former International [2015/05]H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES BETRIEBSZUSTANDES FÜR MEHRERE KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZE[2015/05]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING OPERATIONAL STATUS FOR MULTIPLE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS[2015/05]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UN ÉTAT OPÉRATIONNEL POUR DE MULTIPLES RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2014National basic fee paid 
17.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
18.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2019Fee for grant paid
11.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[I]US2007217436  (MARKLEY JEFFREY P [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0171] * * paragraph [0174] *;
 [I]WO0180501  (WIDCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1 - page 5 *;
 [A]WO2010099229  (T MOBILE USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] *