Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798578

EP2798578 - CLUSTERING-BASED OBJECT CLASSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pelco, Inc.
3500 Pelco Way
Clovis, CA 93612 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHU, Hongwei
11321 N. Verona Way
Fresno, California 93730 / US
02 / AGHDASI, Farzin
133 W. Bedford Ave.
Clovis, California 93611 / US
03 / MILLAR, Greg
32121 Bass Field Road
Coarsegold, California 93614 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Harding, Andrew Philip
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Zerbi, Guido Maria
Murgitroyd & Company
Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date12806821.012.12.2012
WO2012US69148
Priority number, dateUS20111333861728.12.2011         Original published format: US201113338617
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013101460
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2798578
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/68
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:CLUSTERBASIERTE OBJEKTKLASSIFIZIERUNG[2014/45]
English:CLUSTERING-BASED OBJECT CLASSIFICATION[2014/45]
French:CLASSEMENT D'OBJET BASÉ SUR UN REGROUPEMENT[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2014National basic fee paid 
16.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]  - Bose ET AL, "Learning to Use Scene Context for Object Classification in Surveillance", IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON VISUAL SURVEILLANCE AND PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF TRACKING AND SURVEILLANCE, (20031011), pages 94 - 101, URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.10.1944&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20121017), XP055041495 [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12,15-17,19,22-24,26 * page 2, column l, line 38 - line 44 * * page 2, column r, paragraph 2.1 - page 3, column l, paragraph 2.2 *
by applicantUS7391907
 US2010054535
 US2011050897