Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823643

EP2823643 - A METHOD OF RECOMMENDING ITEMS TO A GROUP OF USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing DTV
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/21]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / IOANNIDIS, Stratis
199 New Montgomery St. 307
San Francisco, California 94105 / US
02 / YAN, Jinyun
450 N. Mathilda Avenue
Apartment A304
Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US
03 / BENTO AYRES PEREIRA, Jose
61 Fayette Street
Apartment 7
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
12 place des Halles Saint Louis
56100 Lorient / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12806830.113.12.2012
WO2012US69370
Priority number, dateUS201261608171P08.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261608171 P
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013133879
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2823643
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/466
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFEHLEN VON ARTIKELN AN EINE BENUTZERGRUPPE[2015/03]
English:A METHOD OF RECOMMENDING ITEMS TO A GROUP OF USERS[2015/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR RECOMMANDER DES ARTICLES À UN GROUPE D'UTILISATEURS[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
24.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/50]
26.07.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2018
02.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/50]
19.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012016642  (LI LIHONG [US] ET AL) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0041] , [0050] - [0054] - [0068] , [0082]; figures 1,5,6; claim - *;
 [A]US2009043597  (AGARWAL DEEPAK [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - CEM TEKIN ET AL, "Adaptive learning of uncontrolled restless bandits with logarithmic regret", COMMUNICATION, CONTROL, AND COMPUTING (ALLERTON), 2011 49TH ANNUAL ALLERTON CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110928), doi:10.1109/ALLERTON.2011.6120273, ISBN 978-1-4577-1817-5, pages 983 - 990, XP032085654 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/Allerton.2011.6120273
 [A]  - ANANDKUMAR A ET AL, "Distributed Algorithms for Learning and Cognitive Medium Access with Logarithmic Regret", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20110401), vol. 29, no. 4, doi:10.1109/JSAC.2011.110406, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 731 - 745, XP011479070 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.2011.110406
 [A]  - CHRISTOPHER D ROSIN, "Multi-armed bandits with episode context", ANNALS OF MATHEMATICS AND ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20110826), vol. 61, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S10472-011-9258-6, ISSN 1573-7470, pages 203 - 230, XP019985750 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10472-011-9258-6
by applicant   - G. P. LILIANA ARDISSONO; ANNA GOY; M. SEGNAN; P. TORASSO, "Personalized recommendation of tourist attractions for desktop and handset devices", APPLIED ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, (2003), pages 687 - 714
    - THEORY; J. MASTHOFF, "the Average without Misery Strategy'', and ''the Least Misery Strategy", THE AVERAGE STRATEGY