Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2797734 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2797734



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 260
10.02.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
02.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.01.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.01.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.01.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.01.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
08.01.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
16.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 22
16.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
16.12.2015 Description Search / examination 21
16.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
03.09.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.09.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.09.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
10.08.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.09.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
08.08.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
15.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
07.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.12.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
21.12.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
21.12.2012 Description International Searching Authority 22
21.12.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1