Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2797734


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
10.02.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
28.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
30.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
04.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
05.02.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.02.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.01.2016 Change - classification published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Change - classification published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.09.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.08.2015 Change - classification published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
28.08.2015 Change - classification published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
14.08.2015 Change - classification published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
14.08.2015 Change - classification published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication