Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797734

EP2797734 - METHOD OF MAKING COLORED CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / MORGAN, Courtney Flem
3215 Summer View Drive
Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US
02 / CORTI, Sandra
3420 Ashton Drive
Suwanne, GA 30024 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12806831.913.12.2012
[2016/14]
WO2012US69452
Priority number, dateUS201161582279P31.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161582279 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101481
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797734
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2797734
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C37/00, B29D11/00, // B29C35/08
[2015/38]
Former International [2014/45]B29D11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG FARBIGER KONTAKTLINSEN[2014/45]
English:METHOD OF MAKING COLORED CONTACT LENSES[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT COLORÉES[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2014National basic fee paid 
29.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
03.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2016Fee for grant paid
02.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2015
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.04.2016
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
LU13.12.2016
MT13.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
LU13.12.2016
MT13.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/43]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
LU13.12.2016
MT13.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/38]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
LU13.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2018/31]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
LU13.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/49]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
LU13.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL06.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2005218536  (QUINN MICHAEL H [US], et al) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0132] *;
 [AD]US5597519  (MARTIN WALLACE A [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 8, paragraph 2 *
by applicantUS4668240
 US4857072
 US5272010
 US5414477
 US2003054109
 US2004044099
 US4536554
 US4983702
 US5087392
 US5656210
 US7550519
 US8147728
 US5760100
 US6827440
 US3536386
 US4582402
 US4704017
 US5034166
 US2008150178
 US6113817
 US5555504
 US5362767
 US5391589
 US5597519
 US5681510
 EP19950937446