Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2726669

EP2726669 - GRINDER FOR LIGNOCELLULOSE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/19]FEED SCREW, FEED SCREW ARRANGEMENT AND GRINDER FOR LIGNOCELLULOSE MATERIAL
[2017/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Aktiebolag
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
[2014/25]
Former [2014/19]For all designated states
Metso Paper Sweden AB
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Inventor(s)01 / AHLGREN, Örjan
Bergsgatan 9
852 36 Sundsvall / SE
 [2017/39]
Former [2014/19]01 / AHLGREN, Örjan
Bergsgatan 9
S-852 36 Sundsvall / SE
Representative(s)Saitton, Hanna Johanna
Metso Paper Sundsvall AB
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Saitton, Hanna Johanna
Metso Paper Sundsvall AB
S-851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Application number, filing date12807697.328.06.2012
[2017/39]
WO2012SE00099
Priority number, dateSE2011005062101.07.2011         Original published format: SE 1150621
[2014/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013006107
Date:10.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2726669
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013
[2014/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2726669
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.01.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:D21B1/22, B02C7/16, B30B9/12, B02C7/11, D21D1/30
[2015/15]
Former International [2014/19]D21B1/22, B02C7/16, B30B9/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZERKLEINERER FÜR EIN LIGNOCELLULOSEMATERIAL[2017/26]
English:GRINDER FOR LIGNOCELLULOSE MATERIAL[2017/26]
French:BROYEUR POUR SUBSTANCE LIGNOCELLULOSIQUE[2017/26]
Former [2014/19]FÖRDERSCHNECKE, FÖRDERSCHNECKENANORDNUNG UND ZERKLEINERER FÜR EIN LIGNOCELLULOSEMATERIAL
Former [2014/19]FEED SCREW, FEED SCREW ARRANGEMENT AND GRINDER FOR LIGNOCELLULOSE MATERIAL
Former [2014/19]VIS SANS FIN D'ALIMENTATION, DISPOSITIF À VIS SANS FIN D'ALIMENTATION, ET BROYEUR POUR SUBSTANCE LIGNOCELLULOSIQUE
Entry into regional phase03.02.2014National basic fee paid 
03.02.2014Search fee paid 
03.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/19]
28.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2017Fee for grant paid
21.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2016
Opposition(s)28.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/39]CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/24]CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/23]CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
NL27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9836836  (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4202505  (RUUSKANEN ERKKI [FI]) [X] 1-6,9-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2009136849  (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * page 4 - page 6; figure - *;
 [X]WO9635016  (SPROUT BAUER INC ANDRITZ [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 6; figures 1,2 *
International search[A]DE3823700  (WTOEZ FLEISCHIND VEB [DD]);
 [A]SE516965  (VALMET FIBERTECH AB [SE]);
 [A]US4220290  (JOHANSSON JOHAN G I [SE]);
 [A]SE532411  (METSO PAPER INC [FI]);
 [A]US5823453  (GARASIMOWICZ GREGORY ALEXANDER [US]);
 [A]US6494994  (AIKAWA YOSHIHIKO [JP]);
 [A]US2001011505  (DIONNE HUGUES [CA]);
 [A]EP0126632  (BLACK CLAWSON CO [US])
by applicantWO9836836