Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2726040

EP2726040 - METHOD OF EJECTING FAULTY ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2016/32]
Former [2014/19]For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI, Kazuhiko
c/o Unicharm Products Fukushima Factory
26-1 Uchiaza Nakasedo
Oaza Kanazawa
Tanagura-cho, Higashishirakawa-Gun
Fukushima 963-6106 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Tomohiro
c/o Technical Center of UNICHARM CORPORATION
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
03 / MIYAKI, Masanobu
c/o Technical Center of UNICHARM CORPORATION
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2014/19]
Representative(s)Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
[2016/32]
Former [2014/19]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12808129.629.06.2012
[2016/32]
WO2012JP04260
Priority number, dateJP2011014778201.07.2011         Original published format: JP 2011147782
[2014/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013005408
Date:10.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2726040
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013
[2014/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2726040
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.01.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F13/49
[2014/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUSSTOSSEN FEHLERHAFTER SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL[2014/19]
English:METHOD OF EJECTING FAULTY ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2014/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉJECTION D'UN ARTICLE ABSORBANT DÉFECTUEUX[2014/19]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2013National basic fee paid 
18.12.2013Search fee paid 
18.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/19]
22.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2016Fee for grant paid
22.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2015
Opposition(s)11.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.06.2012
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/11]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT10.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2554278  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0010] , [0013] , [0014] *;
 [Y]GB687865  (INT CELLUCOTTON PRODUCTS) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 7 * * page 2, line 81 - page 2, line 82 * * page 3, line 29 - page 3, line 40 * * page 4, line 80 - page 4, line 126 * * page 8, line 5 - page 8, line 17 *;
 [Y]US2010305739  (DEBRULER JASON L [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]EP2213449  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP] MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND PRINTING [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]JP2002079187  (KAO CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH10263010  (KAO CORP.);
 [A]JP2010200908  (UNICHARM CORPORATION)
by applicantJP2002079187
 EP2554278
 GB687865
 US2010305739
 EP2213449